## Multiples of 11

1 x 11 = 11

2 x 11 = 22

3 x 11 = 33

4 x 11 = 44

5 x 11 = 55

6 x 11 = 66

7 x 11 = 77

8 x 11 = 88

9 x 11 = 99

10 x 11 = 110

11 x 11 = 121

12 x 11 = 132

In multiples of 11, we count groups of 11.

For example, 5×11 is equal to 5 times 11.Further down the page are study methods, exercises, games, and worksheets for studying multiples of 11.

## Practice multiples of 11 in order

Solve the exercises. Then, click ‘Check’ to see how well you did!

If all the answers are correct, continue to practice the multiples in random order further down the page.

###### 1 x 11 =

###### 2 x 11 =

###### 3 x 11 =

###### 4 x 11 =

###### 5 x 11 =

###### 6 x 11 =

###### 7 x 11 =

###### 8 x 11 =

###### 9 x 11 =

###### 10x11=

###### 11x11=

###### 12x11=

## Practice multiples of 11 in random order

Solve the exercises. Then, click ‘Check’ to see how well you did!

If all the answers are correct, continue to the memory game further down the page.

## Memory game for learning multiples of 11

Try to find the matching questions and answers in as few attempts as possible!

## A puzzle game for learning multiples of 11

Drag the correct answer to each question

## How to learn and memorize multiples of 11

In multiples of 11, we count groups of 11.

For example, 5×11 is equal to 5 times 11

5×11 = 11+11+11+11+11 = 55

**How to easily calculate multiples of 11?**

To calculate an exercise that involves multiplying by 11, simply write twice the number that appears in the exercise.

For example, consider exercise 4×11. In the exercise the number 4 appears, therefore we will write the number 4 twice and get 44.

4 x 11 = 44

This method works until 9. After that, you have to remember the 3 exercises:

10×11=110

11×11=121

12×11=132

**How will we remember them?**

11×10 is easy to remember according to the method of multiplying by 10 (just add 0).

11×11 can be remembered like this: the answer is 11 with a 2 in the middle.

It is also possible to calculate 10×11 according to the method of multiples by 10 and add 11 to the result like this:

11×11=10×11+11=110+11=121

11×12 is easy to remember according to the method of multiplying by 12 (in multiples of 12).

**Interesting to know**

Three-digit multiples of 11 are numbers whose middle digit is the sum of the other two digits. For example, the number 121 is a multiple of 11, because the middle number is 2 and is the sum of the other two digits 1+1=2.